Richmond v. Dahmm
Plaintiff: Tyron Richmond
Defendant: Unknown Sergeant, Rachel E. Bedore, Kevin M. Dahmm and Dustin Durham
Case Number: 4:2024cv01436
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time, Doc. #8 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than Tuesday, January 21, 2025, Plaintiff shall prepay the entire $405 filing fee or submit a properly supported application to proceed in the district court without prepaying fees or costs, complete with certified copy of his account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff three copies of this Memorandum and Order so that Plaintiff may provide copies to the appropriate Department of Corrections officials to assist him in obtaining approval for a $405 filing-fee disbursement or a certified copy of his prison account statement. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on December 19, 2024. (Three copies of this Memorandum and Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (BRP)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Tyron Richmond. (TMT)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and to compel, Docs. [ #5 , #6 ] are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than Friday, December 20, 2024, Plaintiff shall prepay the entire $405 filing fee or submit a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as a certified copy of his account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. (Response to Court due by 12/20/2024.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/19/2024. (TMT)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Tue Nov 19 14:13:18 CST 2024 (Tillman, Tiffani)
November 15, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Tyron Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMT)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Tyron Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMT)
November 15, 2024 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Amendment to #1 Complaint filed by Tyron Richmond. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Tyron Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMT)
October 30, 2024 ***REMARK: The Memorandum and Order #3 and Complaint #1 were mailed to Plaintiff. (BRP)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall return the complaint, Doc. #1 to Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall sign the complaint and return it to the Court no later than Friday, December 13, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, Doc. #2 , is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, no later than Friday, December 13, 2024, Plaintiff shall prepay the entire $405 filing fee or submit a properly supported Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, as well as a certified copy of his trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on October 29, 2024. (BRP)
October 25, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Oct 25 13:00:56 CDT 2024 (admin,)
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyron Richmond. (JBH)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Rachel E. Bedore, Kevin M. Dahmm Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Tyron Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JBH)
October 24, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (JBH)
October 24, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JBH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richmond v. Dahmm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel E. Bedore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. Dahmm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyron Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?