Elliot v. St. Charles Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Mark Elliot, II
Defendant: St. Charles County Court and St. Charles Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2024cv01452
Filed: October 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney H Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2024 Filing 7 Letter to clerk of the court from Plaintiff Mark Elliot, II. (HMA)
November 15, 2024 Filing 6 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Mark Elliot, II. (CLH)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Mark Elliot, II. (CLH)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Tue Nov 5 09:56:22 CST 2024 (Hutson, Chelsea)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs' form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must either pay the $405 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed without prepaying fees or costs within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. (Response to Court due by 12/5/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 11/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Form)(JEB)
November 1, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
November 1, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 1, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Nov 1 11:00:54 CDT 2024 (admin,)
October 29, 2024 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
October 28, 2024 Filing 2 Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Mark Elliot, II. (JWD)
October 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant St. Charles County Court, St. Charles Department of Corrections, Jury Demand,, filed by Mark Elliot, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - St. Charles County Dept of Correction Documents, #2 Envelope)(JWD) [Clerk's note: plaintiff's submitted complaint contains only pages 1-7 of the official form]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliot v. St. Charles Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Elliot, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?