Parker v. State of Missouri
Plaintiff: Raevon Terrell Parker
Defendant: State of Missouri
Case Number: 4:2024cv01468
Filed: November 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff a copy of the following forms: - Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (MOED-0036) - Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (AO-0242) - Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (MOED-0038) - Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (MOED-0046) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than Thursday, January 30, 2025, Plaintiff shall file an amended pleading on the appropriate form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than Thursday, January 30, 2025, Plaintiff shall either pay the applicable filing fee or file an appropriate request to proceed without prepaying the fee, in accordance with the instructions herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff three (3) copies of this Memorandum and Order so that Plaintiff may provide copies to the appropriate jail officials to assist him in obtaining a certified copy of his account statement. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/30/2025.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Attachment Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241, #3 Attachment Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #4 Attachment Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #5 Attachment Copy of Memorandum and Order - 1, #6 Attachment Copy of Memorandum and Order - 2, #7 Attachment Copy of Memorandum and Order - 3)(TMT)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Mon Dec 16 08:18:29 CST 2024 (Tillman, Tiffani)
November 25, 2024 Filing 2 Letter to Clerk of Court from Plaintiff re: inability to obtain financial information from facility. (CBL)
November 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant State of Missouri, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Raevon Terrell Parker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JWD)
November 1, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (JWD)
November 1, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 1, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Nov 1 15:00:46 CDT 2024 (admin,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raevon Terrell Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?