Chambly v. Berry et al
Plaintiff: Eric Chambly
Defendant: Lisa Berry, Jesse Funk and Crystal Francis
Case Number: 4:2024cv01485
Filed: November 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Eric Chambly. (KRZ)
December 9, 2024 ***REMARK: Plaintiff, Eric Chambly, called the Clerk seeing if his application to proceed IFP had been received. The Clerk let him know it had not been received and sent him a new copy of the application. (NEP)
November 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Eric Chambly. (KRZ) (Address updated.) (CBL).
November 20, 2024 Filing 3 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Eric Chambly. (KRZ)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank 'Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs' form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must either pay the $405 filing fee or submit a completed 'Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs' form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff is currently incarcerated and chooses to submit an 'Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs,' he must submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2); 28 U.S.C. 1915(h). IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by Sr. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Form)(NEP)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Wed Nov 6 15:56:52 CST 2024 (Phillips, Nicole)
November 5, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD)
November 5, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 5, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Nov 5 14:00:52 CST 2024 (admin,)
November 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Eric Chambly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Grievance Documents, #2 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambly v. Berry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Chambly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?