Hobson v. Federal Courthouse
Plaintiff: Yule Hobson
Defendant: Federal Courthouse
Case Number: 4:2024cv01691
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2025 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Yule Hobson. Returned document(s): Complaint Letter Created. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (KXS)
December 20, 2024 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Yule Hobson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LNJ)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Yule Hobson. (JAB)
December 16, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
December 16, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
December 16, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Dec 16 11:01:01 CST 2024 (admin,)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Yule Hobson. (JWD)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Federal Courthouse, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Yule Hobson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobson v. Federal Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yule Hobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?