Wewerka v. Cowsky et al
Plaintiff: Derick Wewerka
Defendant: Cowsky, Jane Doe, Cook, Hovis, Ellis, Lynsey and Lewis
Case Number: 2:2008cv04082
Filed: April 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: William A. Knox
Presiding Judge: Scott O. Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of defendants(Russel, Jeri)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 46 49 motions to amend complaint and to add defendants; adopting Report and Recommendations re 62 Report and Recommendations; granting defendant Hovis' 14 motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies and denying as moot defendant Hovis' 14 alternative motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim; granting 22 partial motion to dismiss case; denying as moot 22 motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by District Judge Scott O. Wright on 2-23-09. (Morse, Judy)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 49 MOTION to amend, 46 MOTION for order to add defendants filed by Derick Wewerka be denied; 14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies filed by Hovis be granted and claims against Hovis b e dismissed, without prejudice, or alternatively, 14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Hovis be denied, without prejudice to reconsideration if recommendation to grant motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust is not adopted; [ 22] MOTION to dismiss official capacity claims, claims of denial of medical care, and related allegations of failure to transfer plaintiff to another facility based on his mental health filed by Tony Pridgeon, Hovis, Lewis, Brian Grylewski be granted , and Alternative MOTION for judgment on the pleadings filed by Tony Pridgeon, Hovis, Lewis, Brian Grylewski be denied, without prejudice to reconsideration if recommendation to grant motion to dismiss is not adopted. Objections to R&R due by 2/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 1/29/2009. (skb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wewerka v. Cowsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Wewerka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hovis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?