Scott v. Dormire et al
Plaintiff: James M. Scott, Sr.
Defendant: Dave Dormire, Arthur Woods, Larry Crawford, William Galloway, Jerry Ellis and Rebecca Taylor
Case Number: 2:2008cv04260
Filed: October 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: William A. Knox
Presiding Judge: Scott O. Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ADOPTING, IN PART, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 73 of June 16, 2009 and 89 Report and Recommendation of October 7, 2009. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Feder al Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to comply with court orders. It is further ORDERED that [26, 28, 56, 57, 68, 86] defendants' motions to dismiss are denied as moot. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff's 37 motion for preliminary injunctive relief, 60 to dismiss party and to substitute party, and 72 for sanctions, are denied without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Scott O. Wright on 11/4/2009. (Sandridge, Susan)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 86 MOTION to dismiss case Or In The Alternative, To Amend The Pretrial Scheduling Order To Extend The Discovery And Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Rowland, Galbreath, Larry Crawford, Virginia Beckemeyer, Whittle, Tony Sheehan, Williams, Hovis, Koch, Paul Gore, Leonard, Dave Dormire, Jerozal, Mike Kemna, Tom Clement, Friesen, Michael Ragain, Michelle Findley, Stickly, Cavanaugh, Nathan Rascher, Garnett, Tammy Surface, Martin, Merl E. Williams, Corum, Bray, William Galloway, Andrew Rustemeyer, Chad E. Sheehan, Richard Jones, David Jones, McKenzie, Nkwocha, Larson, Patrick, Jerry Ellison, Green, D. Reed, Turner, Able, Stackman, Graham, Cryglewski, Pettis, Lohmeyer, Rollins be granted; 1 Complaint filed by James M. Scott, Sr., be dismissed, pursuant to Rule 41(b), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Objections to R&R due by 10/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 10/7/2009. (skb)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 37 MOTION for preliminary injunction, 60 MOTION to dismiss party, MOTION to substitute party, 72 MOTION for sanctions filed by James M. Scott, Sr., be denied, without prejudice to refiling if deemed appropriate; [ 57] MOTION to dismiss case or in the alternative Motion To Strike and For A More Definite Statement filed by Rowland, Galbreath, Larry Crawford, Virginia Beckemeyer, Tony Sheehan, Williams, Hovis, Koch, Paul Gore, Leonard, Dave Dormire, Jeroza l, Mike Kemna, Tom Clement, Friesen, Michael Ragain, Michelle Findley, Stickly, Cavanaugh, Nathan Rascher, Garnett, Tammy Surface, Martin, Merl E. Williams, Cassidy, Corum, Bray, Petri, William Galloway, Andrew Rustemeyer, Chad E. Sheehan, Richard Jo nes, David Jones, McKenzie, Nkwocha, Larson, Patrick, Jerry Ellison, Green, D. Reed, Turner, Able, Stackman, Graham, Cryglewski, Meadows, Pettis, Powell, Rollins, Lohmeyer, 26 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Brandee Pierce, Kathy Nolting, Thomas Ba ker, Lucinda Frosch, Pam Swartz be denied, without prejudice to refiling, if deemed appropriate; 68 MOTION to stay Proceedings Against Defendant John Meadow or In The Alternative to Dismiss Defendant John Meadow From The Case filed by Rowlan d, Galbreath, Larry Crawford, Virginia Beckemeyer, Tony Sheehan, Williams, Hovis, Koch, Paul Gore, Leonard, Dave Dormire, Jerozal, Mike Kemna, Tom Clement, Friesen, Michael Ragain, Michelle Findley, Stickly, Cavanaugh, Nathan Rascher, Garnett, Tammy Surface, Cassidy, Merl E. Williams, Martin, Corum, Bray, Petri, William Galloway, Andrew Rustemeyer, Chad E. Sheehan, Richard Jones, David Jones, McKenzie, Nkwocha, Larson, Jerry Ellison, Patrick, Green, D. Reed, Able, Turner, Stackman, Graham, Crygl ewski, Meadows, Powell, Pettis, Rollins, Lohmeyer be granted and claims against defendant John Meadow be dismissed, without prejudice; 28 MOTION to dismiss case Failure to State a Claim filed by Brandee Pierce, Kathy Nolting, Thomas Baker, L ucinda Frosch, Pam Swartz, 56 MOTION for reconsideration re 22 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, for Defend ant Wood filed by Rowland, Galbreath, Larry Crawford, Virginia Beckemeyer, Tony Sheehan, Williams, Hovis, Koch, Paul Gore, Leonard, Dave Dormire, Jerozal, Mike Kemna, Tom Clement, Friesen, Michael Ragain, Michelle Findley, Stickly, Cavanaugh, Nat han Rascher, Garnett, Tammy Surface, Cassidy, Merl E. Williams, Martin, Corum, Bray, Petri, William Galloway, Andrew Rustemeyer, Chad E. Sheehan, Richard Jones, David Jones, McKenzie, Nkwocha, Larson, Jerry Ellison, Patrick, Green, D. Reed, Able, Turner, Stackman, Graham, Cryglewski, Meadows, Powell, Pettis, Rollins, Lohmeyer be denied, without prejudice to refiling if deemed appropriate. Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 6/16/2009. (skb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Dormire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Scott, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Dormire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?