Johnson v. West Publishing Corporation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Marcy A. Johnson
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2010cv04027
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Andrew
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2721 Driver's Privacy Protection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2010 Filing 31 SUGGESTIONS in support re 30 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Williams, Kurt)
August 30, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of West Publishing Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/16/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Williams, Kurt)
July 20, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE of appearance by Don P. Saxton on behalf of Marcy A. Johnson (Saxton, Don)
July 19, 2010 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marcy A. Johnson filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Plaintiff Marcy A. Johnson.(Burgess, Mitchell)
July 8, 2010 Settlement Conference (EAP) set for 9/27/2010 10:30 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, Jefferson City (MW) before Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. Signed on 7/8/10 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. (Price, Jackie)
June 23, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE of appearance by Ralph K. Phalen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Phalen, Ralph)
June 23, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE of appearance by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Marcy A. Johnson (Burgess, Mitchell)
May 19, 2010 Filing 25 Notice of EAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 EAP General Order) 60 days after an answer is filed parties are to contact Jackie at 573-556-7561 or jackie_price@mow.uscourts.gov for a list of possible dates.(Price, Jackie)
May 12, 2010 Filing 24 RULES OF TRIAL entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. (Kanies, Renea)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Class Discovery due 11/10/2010. Class Certification Motion due 12/10/2010. Discovery on the merits due 4/13/2011. Dispositive Motions due 5/13/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2011 at 11:00 AM in District Courtroom, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in District Courtroom, Jefferson City. (Attachments: # 1 Memo on PTC) (Kanies, Renea)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 18 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
May 10, 2010 Filing 21 RESPONSE to motion re 18 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Ben Barnow on behalf of Plaintiff Marcy A. Johnson. Reply suggestions due by 5/27/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court (Barnow, Ben)
April 30, 2010 Filing 20 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER , Joint by Marcy A. Johnson. (Meyerkord, Matthew)
April 23, 2010 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in support re 18 MOTION for order Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of Defendant West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Wiles Opinion)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Williams, Kurt)
April 23, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of West Publishing Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/10/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Williams, Kurt) Modified on 4/26/2010 (James, Carrie).
April 23, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, (And Affirmative Defenses) filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of Defendant West Publishing Corporation.(Williams, Kurt)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 11 motion to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorney Diane Green-Kelly for West Publishing Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Bax, Laura)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 motion to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorney David Z Smith for West Publishing Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Russel, Jeri)
April 20, 2010 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew D. Meyerkord on behalf of Plaintiff Marcy A. Johnson.(Meyerkord, Matthew)
April 19, 2010 Filing 13 Motion to allow David Z. Smith to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-2348550) filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of West Publishing Corporation. (Williams, Kurt)
April 16, 2010 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Nick J. Kurt on behalf of Defendant West Publishing Corporation.(Kurt, Nick)
April 15, 2010 Filing 11 Motion to allow Diane Green-Kelly to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-2345700) filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of West Publishing Corporation. (Williams, Kurt)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 motion to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorney Ben Barnow for Marcy A. Johnson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Signed on 4/6/10 by Unassigned. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(James, Carrie)
April 5, 2010 Filing 9 Motion to allow Ben Barnow to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-2335794) filed by Matthew D. Meyerkord on behalf of Marcy A. Johnson. (Meyerkord, Matthew)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/30/2010. Rule 26 conference due by 4/16/2010. (Kanies, Renea)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. West Publishing Corporation's answer is due on or before 4/23/2010. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
March 22, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, (Agreed) filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of West Publishing Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Williams, Kurt)
March 22, 2010 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of Defendant West Publishing Corporation.(Williams, Kurt)
March 22, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Nick J. Kurt on behalf of West Publishing Corporation (Kurt, Nick)
March 22, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Kurt D. Williams on behalf of West Publishing Corporation (Williams, Kurt)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Service must be obtained within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. (Kanies, Renea)
February 23, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to West Publishing Corporation. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
February 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against West Publishing Corporation filed by Matthew D. Meyerkord on behalf of Marcy A. Johnson. Filing fee $350, receipt number 0866-2293284. Service due by 6/22/2010.(Meyerkord, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Price, Jackie). Modified on 2/22/2010 to correct receipt no.(Jones, Robin).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. West Publishing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy A. Johnson
Represented By: Matthew D. Meyerkord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?