Lipp et al v. Ginger C, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: John P. Lipp and Stephanie S. Lipp
Defendant: Ginger C, L.L.C., Pi Kappa Phi Fraternity National Headquarters and Pi Kappa Phi Fraternity Missouri Beta Epsilon Chapter
Case Number: 2:2015cv04257
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Parties' Joint Motion for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlement, [Doc. 477 ], is granted. (Farrington, Elizabeth)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony of David Chase, [Docs. 354 , 363 ], are granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony of Robert Griswold, [Docs. 355 , 365 ], are granted in part and denied in part.(Farrington, Elizabeth)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Defendant Pi Kappa Phi National Fraternity [Doc. 148 ] is denied. (Rosenbaum, Daniel)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Defendant Ginger Cs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [Doc. 79 ] is denied. Defendant ACCs Motion to Dismiss [Docs. 46 , 54 , 81 ] is denied. Defendant PKPs Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 43 ] is granted. How ever, with regards to the premise liability claim alleged against PKP Chapter, Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute [Doc. 39 ] is granted, and Plaintiffs may assert this claim against Scott Swafford, representative of the unincorporated association PKP C hapter. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint [Doc. 129 ] is granted for the purposes of (1) adding factual allegations against Roland Management, including allegations that apply to other defendants and (2) substituting Scott Swafford in place of PKP Chapter. Plaintiffs shall file this complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Plaintiffs other motions for leave to amend [Docs. 72 , 89 ] are denied as moot. No further amendments will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. (Rosenbaum, Daniel)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. The parties' Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order [Doc. 37 ] is granted. However, if a party wishes to file, under seal, a document containing information designated confidential pursuant to the protective order, the party must seek and obtain leave from the Court prior to filing the document under seal. (Rosenbaum, Daniel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipp et al v. Ginger C, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Lipp
Represented By: Aaron W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie S. Lipp
Represented By: Aaron W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger C, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey Hyatt Blaylock
Represented By: Clayton Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pi Kappa Phi Fraternity National Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pi Kappa Phi Fraternity Missouri Beta Epsilon Chapter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?