Postawko v. Corizon Medical Services et al
Plaintiff: Michael G Postawko
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services
Case Number: 2:2016cv04219
Filed: July 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The motions for appointment of counsel, Doc. 222 , and for injunctive relief, Doc. 223 , are denied. Signed on 1/24/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Filer will mail a copy of this order to Darrin Walker via regular mail.) (Levy, Lindsey)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Motion to intervene, Doc. 197 , is denied. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' motion to certify class, Doc. 77 . Signed on 7/26/2017 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Specker, Suzanne)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants MDOC, Adrienne Hardy, and Anne Precythe's motion to dismiss, Doc. 103 . The motion is granted as to Defendant Precythe in her official capacity in Counts III, V, and VII; these claims are di smissed against Precythe in her official capacity with prejudice. The motion is also granted as to Defendant Hardy, only, in Count V. Dismissal is denied for the remainder of Plaintiffs' claims. Signed on 5/11/2017 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Specker, Suzanne)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Postawko v. Corizon Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Postawko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?