Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company v. Burnett et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company - OH and Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Defendant: Dakota Fogle, Courtney Lawhorn, Jeanette Allen, Travis Bush, Lorrell Lawhorn, Javion Lawhorn, Derrick Burnett, Laquin Palmer and Lorell Lawhorn
Case Number: 2:2018cv04243
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED as to Travis Bush, Dakota Fogle, Laquin Palmer and emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Lock, Tania)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time, Doc. #8 , is granted. Plaintiff must file proof of service for all defendants on or before February 27, 2019. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jackson, Rachel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time filed by Brette S. Hart on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hart, Brette)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. Courtney Lawhorn served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Hart, Brette)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. Jeanette Allen served on 12/9/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hart, Brette) Modified on 12/17/2018 to modified date served to reflect service date as provided on the document. (Geiser, Angel).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 11/30/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Matthew William Greenberg on behalf of Plaintiff Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company.(Greenberg, Matthew)
November 30, 2018 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's attorney as to Jeanette Allen, Derrick Burnett, Travis Bush, Dakota Fogle, Courtney Lawhorn, Javion Lawhorn, Lorell Lawhorn, Laquin Palmer. (Geiser, Angel)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew William Greenberg on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company - OH (Attorney Matthew William Greenberg added to party Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company - OH(pty:pla))(Greenberg, Matthew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brette S. Hart on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company - OH. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6056308. Service due by 2/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hart, Brette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company v. Burnett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Fogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Lawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorrell Lawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javion Lawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laquin Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorell Lawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company - OH
Represented By: Brette S. Hart
Represented By: Matthew William Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Represented By: Brette S. Hart
Represented By: Matthew William Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?