Poole v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mary Therese Poole
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv04007
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Julianne O'Bannon Germinder on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Therese Poole.(Germinder, Julianne)
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Thomas R Chibnall on behalf of Defendant Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Chibnall, Thomas)
March 11, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartford Fire Insurance Company filed by Julianne O'Bannon Germinder on behalf of Mary Therese Poole.(Germinder, Julianne)
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Parties are directed to review the MAP General Order docketed in this case. All persons with actual settlement authority are required to attend the mediation. Additionally, if an insurance representatives approval is required to settle, they must attend in person. Parties are also directed to submit a combined mediation statement of no more than four pages to Jackie_price@mow.uscourts.gov at least seven days prior to the mediation. Settlement Conference set for 4/8/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A, Jefferson City (WJE) before Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps Jr. (Geiser, Angel)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant's discovery requests, Doc. #19 , is granted. Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's discovery requests are due by April 10, 2019. Signed on 3/8/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Discovery Requests filed by Julianne O'Bannon Germinder on behalf of Mary Therese Poole. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Germinder, Julianne)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 2/20/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendant's unopposed motion to continue the trial date, Doc. #15 , is granted. This case is set for trial on the jury docket commencing at 9:00 a.m. on May 11, 2020, in Courtroom 4A, United States District Court, 80 Lafayette Street, Jefferson City, Missouri. Signed on 2/20/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Kuehnel, Sarah)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to continue filed by Sarah Kuehnel on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kuehnel, Sarah)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 2/7/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 11:00 AM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 2/7/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Mary Therese Poole. (Germinder, Julianne)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The parties' joint motion for extension of time to make initial Rule 26 disclosures, Doc. #9 , and Defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file an answer, Doc. #10 , are granted. Defendant's answer is due on or before February 19, 2019. The parties' initial disclosures are due on or before March 11, 2019. Signed on 1/28/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER filed by Thomas R Chibnall on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Chibnall, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for extension of time JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Thomas R Chibnall on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Chibnall, Thomas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH THE STATE COURT by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal)(Kuehnel, Sarah)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Thomas R Chibnall on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Attorney Thomas R Chibnall added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Chibnall, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/1/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 1/25/2019. Signed on 1/11/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 1/11/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Sarah Kuehnel on behalf of Defendant Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Kuehnel, Sarah)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing NOTICE TO PARTIES OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Kuehnel, Sarah)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone County County, case number 18BA-CV04717, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6119736. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Service, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Fazzino Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kuehnel, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poole v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Therese Poole
Represented By: Julianne O'Bannon Germinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah Kuehnel
Represented By: Thomas R Chibnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?