Ames v. Integrity Home Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carole Ames
Defendant: Integrity Home Care, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04011
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carole Ames of Pltfs 1st RFP ro Def filed by Andre E. Townsel on behalf of Plaintiff Carole Ames.(Townsel, Andre)
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carole Ames of Platinff's 1st ROGS to Def filed by Andre E. Townsel on behalf of Plaintiff Carole Ames.(Townsel, Andre)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. #8 ). (Sreeprakash, Netra)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 2/25/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendant's consent motion to continue the trial date, Doc. #17 , is GRANTED. The jury trial will be conducted during the two-week docket beginning May 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL), before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Signed on February 25, 2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Integrity Home Care, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Fowler, Tina)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to continue Trial Setting filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Integrity Home Care, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fowler, Tina)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jeff Parshall(Fowler, Tina)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Andre E. Townsel on behalf of Plaintiff Carole Ames. Reply suggestions due by 2/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Townsel, Andre)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 2/7/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 2/7/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Andre E. Townsel on behalf of Plaintiff Carole Ames.(Townsel, Andre)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Integrity Home Care, Inc..(Fowler, Tina)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER / Discovery Plan by Integrity Home Care, Inc.. (Fowler, Tina)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Integrity Home Care, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Fowler, Tina)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fowler, Tina)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Counts I, II, III, V, and VI on behalf of Integrity Home Care, Inc..(Fowler, Tina)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/1/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 1/25/2019. Signed on 1/18/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 1/18/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Lock, Tania)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Integrity Home Care, Inc..(Fowler, Tina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing to Parties of Removal by Integrity Home Care, Inc. (Fowler, Tina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Boone County County, case number 18BA-CV05030, filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Integrity Home Care, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6132091. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fowler, Tina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ames v. Integrity Home Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Home Care, Inc.
Represented By: Tina G. Fowler
Represented By: Rachel A Riso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Ames
Represented By: Andre E. Townsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?