Witt v. United States of America, Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Mark A Witt
Defendant: Daniel Seth Hoyt, M.D., Katie Murray, M.D. and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04012
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to attorney's for defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to substitute party filed by Cari Franke Walsh on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walsh, Cari)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Wade Hamp Ford on behalf of Defendant Katie Murray, M.D.. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Ford, Wade)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Wade Hamp Ford on behalf of Katie Murray, M.D.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ford, Wade)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Katie Murray, M.D..(Ford, Wade)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Wade Hamp Ford on behalf of Katie Murray, M.D. (Attorney Wade Hamp Ford added to party Katie Murray, M.D.(pty:dft))(Ford, Wade)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Jeffrey Hyatt Blaylock on behalf of Katie Murray, M.D. (Attorney Jeffrey Hyatt Blaylock added to party Katie Murray, M.D.(pty:dft))(Blaylock, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mark A Witt. Katie Murray, M.D. served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Uhrig, Matthew)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mark A Witt. Daniel Seth Hoyt, M.D. served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Uhrig, Matthew)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Cari Franke Walsh on behalf of United States of America (Attorney Cari Franke Walsh added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Walsh, Cari)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mark A Witt. United States of America served on 2/1/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Uhrig, Matthew)
February 1, 2019 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's attorney as to Daniel Seth Hoyt, M.D., Katie Murray, and Harry S Truman VA Hospital. (Geiser, Angel)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's attorney. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 2/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DANIEL HOYT, MD, Harry S Truman VA Hospital, KATIE MURRAY, MD filed by Matthew B. Uhrig on behalf of MARK A WITT. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6132617. Service due by 4/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Uhrig, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witt v. United States of America, Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Seth Hoyt, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Murray, M.D.
Represented By: Jeffrey Hyatt Blaylock
Represented By: Wade Hamp Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Cari Franke Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Witt
Represented By: Fredrick J. Ludwig
Represented By: Matthew B. Uhrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?