Worthly v. Graber Crews, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jason Worthly and Jason Worthley
Defendant: Martin Metal Sales, LLC, Graber Crews, LLC, Martin Metal Leasing, LLC and Martin Metal, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04045
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Worthley Plaintiff's 1st ROGS and 1st RFP to Defendants filed by Shelly A. Kintzel on behalf of Plaintiff Jason Worthley.(Kintzel, Shelly)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 4/3/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 4/3/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY. Teleconference held before the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey on April 3, 2019 regarding the Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, Doc. #6 . Statements presented by counsel regarding the case and the basis for extended discovery. Mr. Van Ronzelen explained that the case involves multiple corporate defendants and that some witnesses are out of state. Mr. Tranen stated that safety and damage experts might be designated. The parties agreed the proposed expert schedule could be shortened one month. The Court will adopt the proposed schedule with this modification and enter a Scheduling Order. Appearances: Plaintiff by Shelly Kintzel and Timothy Van Ronzelen. Defendants by Daniel Tranen. Court Reporter. None. Courtroom Deputy: Renea Matthes Mitra. (Text entry only.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/3/2019 at 10:00 AM regarding the Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, Doc. 6. The parties shall call conference number 877-336-1828, access code: 8503666 to participate. Signed on 4/2/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER /Discovery Plan by Jason Worthley. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Graber Crews, LLC, Martin Metal Leasing, LLC, Martin Metal Sales, LLC, Martin Metal, LLC.(Tranen, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/25/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 3/18/2019. Signed on 3/4/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 3/4/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(James, Carrie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Morgan County, Missouri County, case number 19-MG-CC0011, filed by Daniel E. Tranen on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6199091. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tranen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worthly v. Graber Crews, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Metal Sales, LLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graber Crews, LLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Metal Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Metal, LLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Worthly
Represented By: Timothy W. Van Ronzelen
Represented By: Shelly A. Kintzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Worthley
Represented By: Timothy W. Van Ronzelen
Represented By: Shelly A. Kintzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?