Owens v. Credit Reporting Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Owens
Defendant: Credit Reporting Services, Inc. and Trans Union Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04106
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a change in Judge assignment only. The case number shall now read 2:19-cv-4106-NKL. Text entry only. No document attached. (Geiser, Angel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of dismissal by Anthony Owens. (Klote, Gregory)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Anthony Owens (Klote, Gregory)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES on behalf of Trans Union Corp..(Huse, William)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to attorney for defendant Trans Union Corp. Second notice emailed to attorneys for plaintiff. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 7/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of settlement as to Defendant Credit Reporting Services, Inc. Only by Anthony Owens (Motil, Gregory)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney William M Huse for Trans Union Corp. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow William M. Huse to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6345377) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union Corp.. (Lubben, Todd)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant Trans Union Corp..(Lubben, Todd)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union Corp. (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party Trans Union Corp.(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Anthony Owens. Credit Reporting Services, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Motil, Gregory) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/4/2019 to delete blank pages) (Geiser, Angel).
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Anthony Owens. Trans Union Corp. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 21, 2019 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's attorney as to Credit Reporting Services, Inc., Trans Union Corp.. (Geiser, Angel)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's attorney. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 6/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Credit Reporting Services, Inc., Trans Union Corp. filed by Gregory Stephen Motil on behalf of Anthony Owens. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6322401. Service due by 8/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Final CCS, #2 Exhibit A- Dispute Letter, #3 Exhibit B- Updated Credit Report)(Motil, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Credit Reporting Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Reporting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union Corp.
Represented By: William M Huse
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Owens
Represented By: Gregory M Klote
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Motil
Represented By: Joel S Halvorsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?