Theberge v. Saul
Plaintiff: Linda Theberge
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv04145
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 8/1/2019 Social security answer due by 9/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 10/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: US Atty 8/1/19; Offfice of Regional Counsel 8/1/19; Atty General 8/6/19)(Overton, Kathleen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Andrew M. Saul, Linda Theberge. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
July 30, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 8/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lock, Tania)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Linda Theberge. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMOWDC-6403384) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Linda Theberge. Service due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Linda Theberge(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theberge v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Theberge
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?