Burkhart v. Flores et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Scott Burkhart
Defendant: Jason Vandonsel, Tony Helms, Officer Flores, Walter Moehle, Drew Garton and Brian Vinson
Case Number: 2:2019cv04199
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must be accompanied by Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss, as previously ordered. (Davies, Cindy)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must be accompanied by Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss, as previously ordered. Signed on November 27, 2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Davies, Cindy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to order re 3 Order, filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Officer Flores, Drew Garton, Tony Helms, Jason Vandonsel, Brian Vinson. (Related document(s) 3 ) (Baker, David)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff file a response, on or before November 26, 2019, to Defendants' motion to dismiss case (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiff's failure to file a timely response will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on 11/12/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Doty, Greg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION to dismiss case filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Officer Flores, Drew Garton, Tony Helms, Jason Vandonsel, Brian Vinson. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Baker, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss case filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Officer Flores, Drew Garton, Tony Helms, Jason Vandonsel, Brian Vinson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Baker, David)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that, on or before November 21, 2019, counsel for Defendants Flores, Garton, Vandonsel, Vinson, and Helms shall inform the Court as to whether or not service of process will be waived for Defendant Moehle. Signed on 11/7/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Doty, Greg)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by David S. Baker on behalf of Officer Flores, Drew Garton, Tony Helms, Jason Vandonsel, Brian Vinson (Attorney David S. Baker added to party Officer Flores(pty:dft), Attorney David S. Baker added to party Drew Garton(pty:dft), Attorney David S. Baker added to party Tony Helms(pty:dft), Attorney David S. Baker added to party Jason Vandonsel(pty:dft), Attorney David S. Baker added to party Brian Vinson(pty:dft))(Baker, David)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Camden County Circuit Court County, case number 19CM-CC00201, filed by Nichole Caldwell on behalf of Brian Vinson, Drew Garton, Tony Helms, Officer Flores, Jason Vandonsel. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6570888. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket Entries & Documents Filed in Circuit Court, #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Caldwell, Nichole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkhart v. Flores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Scott Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Vandonsel
Represented By: Nichole Caldwell
Represented By: David S. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Helms
Represented By: Nichole Caldwell
Represented By: David S. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Flores
Represented By: Nichole Caldwell
Represented By: David S. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Moehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Garton
Represented By: Nichole Caldwell
Represented By: David S. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Vinson
Represented By: Nichole Caldwell
Represented By: David S. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?