Humphrey vs. El Jimador, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Humphrey
Defendant: El Jimador, Inc. and El Sombrerillo, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04220
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. In light of the fact that Plaintiff filed an amended complaint naming a new defendant, the Court extends the deadline for obtaining service on all defendants to forty (40) days from the date of this Order. Signed on February 7, 2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Gabrielle Humphrey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Stiles, Megan) Modified on 1/31/2020 To reflect correct name of filing(James, Carrie).
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Gabrielle Humphrey (Attorney Megan Lowe Stiles added to party Gabrielle Humphrey(pty:pla))(Stiles, Megan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Ryan E. Bertels on behalf of El Jimador, Inc. (Attorney Ryan E. Bertels added to party El Jimador, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bertels, Ryan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gabrielle Humphrey. El Jimador, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Stiles, Megan)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 12/19/19 as Document No. 4, ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. The document has been deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 12/12/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
December 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to El Jimador, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT GABRIELLE HUMPHREY against EL JIMADOR filed by Marc N. Middleton on behalf of Gabrielle Humphrey. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6622483. Service due by 3/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Middleton, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey vs. El Jimador, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Jimador, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan E. Bertels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Sombrerillo, LLC
Represented By: Ryan E. Bertels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Humphrey
Represented By: Marc N. Middleton
Represented By: Megan Lowe Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?