Sampson v. JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A.
Plaintiff: Patrick Sampson
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A. and Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04028
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY. Teleconference held before the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey on April 17, 2020 regarding Defendants Motion for Additional Extension of Time to Respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint, Doc. 14. Mr. Root stated that he will be able to file a responsive pleading by April 22 and will not ask for any further extensions. The Court will give the Defendant until April 22, 2020 to file a responsive pleading. No further extensions will be granted. Appearances: Plaintiff by: J D Haas. Defendant by Jeremy Root. Court Reporter: None. Courtroom Deputy: Renea Matthes Mitra. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/17/2020 at 11:00 AM regarding Defendant's Third Motion for Extension of Time to file their Answer. The parties shall call conference number 877-336-1828, access code: 8503666 to participate. Signed on 4/16/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/16/2020 at 11:00 AM regarding Defendant's Third Motion for Extension of Time to file their Answer. The parties shall call conference number 877-336-1828, access code: 8503666 to participate. Signed on 4/16/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #6 Amended Complaint filed by Jeremy A. Root on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Root, Jeremy)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Haas, J)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Doc. #11 , is granted. Defendants must respond on or before April 15, 2020. Signed on 04/02/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Thompson, Amy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #6 Amended Complaint filed by Jeremy A. Root on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Root, Jeremy)
March 25, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/9/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 4/2/2020. Signed on 3/19/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants' consent motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Doc. #8 , is granted. Defendants must respond on or before April 1, 2020. Signed on 03/19/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Thompson, Amy)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #6 Amended Complaint filed by Jeremy A. Root on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Attorney Jeremy A. Root added to party Chase Bank USA, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy A. Root added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A.(pty:dft))(Root, Jeremy)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Patrick Sampson. Chase Bank USA, N.A. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Haas, J)
February 25, 2020 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's attorney as to Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Geiser, Angel)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A. filed by J D Haas on behalf of Patrick Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended)(Haas, J)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 2/19/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a change in Judge assignment only. The case number shall now read 2:20-cv-4028-NKL. Text entry only. No document attached. (Geiser, Angel)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 2/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Epps, Willie)
February 19, 2020 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A. and emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Lock, Tania)
February 19, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lock, Tania)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Lock, Tania)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A. filed by J D Haas on behalf of Patrick Sampson. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6733813. Service due by 5/19/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haas, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson v. JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Sampson
Represented By: J D Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?