Curry v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Tracy Curry
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC doing business as Lowe's Home Improvement
Case Number: 2:2020cv04101
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 8/5/2020. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Brandon Potter. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Jessica Brasel. Time in court: 10:30 a.m. to 10:36 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 6/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2021. Please see Order for additional deadlines. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2022 09:00 AM (for four days) in Courtroom 4B, Jefferson City (VDJJC) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 2/10/2022 09:00 AM Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 8/5/20 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Counsel are to use the following information for teleconference participation: Phone Number 877-336-1839; Access Code: 6328169. (Anderson, Christy)
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Nancy Kenner(Potter, Brandon)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Nancy Kenner(Potter, Brandon)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/20 at 10:30 am has been RESET to a Scheduling Teleconference on 8/5/2020 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Counsel are to use the following information for teleconference participation: Phone Number 877-336-1839; Access Code: 6328169. (Anderson, Christy)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brandon C. Potter on behalf of Plaintiff Tracy Curry.(Potter, Brandon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Tracy Curry. (Potter, Brandon)
June 17, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/10/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 6/26/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 6/11/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Lock, Tania)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Brasel, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica A. Brasel on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Brasel, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jessica A. Brasel on behalf of Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Brasel, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Brasel, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Miller County, Missouri County, case number 20ML-CC00024, filed by Jessica A. Brasel on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6891662. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brasel, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Curry
Represented By: Brandon C. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Jessica A. Brasel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC doing business as Lowe's Home Improvement
Represented By: Jessica A. Brasel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?