Acuity Insurance Company v. Ozark Cultured Stone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Acuity Insurance Company
Defendant: Ozark Custom Stone, Mud Brothers Custom Exteriors, David Lenshyn, Ozark Cultured Stone, LLC, Mud Brothers Stucco, Inc. and Spillman Contracting, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04104
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spillman Contracting, LLC and forwarded to Plaintiff by email for service. (Warren, Melissa)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY. Teleconference held before the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey regarding service of the Defendants. Mr. Leritz stated that he requested the Defendants waive service when the Complaint was filed. He has been informed that Defendant Spillman Contracting, LLC will not waive service and he will need to have them served. The other Defendants attorney has informed him that they will waive service. The Court ordered that Plaintiff file a notice on ECF regarding the status of service and since there is not an entry of appearance for Defendants the motion to shorten time for service is denied. Appearances: Plaintiff by Christopher Leritz. No Appearance by Defendants. Court Reporter: None. Courtroom Deputy: Renea Matthes Mitra. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/7/2020 at 10:00 AM regarding service. The parties shall call conference number 877-336-1828, access code: 8503666 to participate. Signed on 8/5/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Christopher P. Leritz on behalf of Acuity Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment)(Leritz, Christopher)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Service Response Time, Doc. #3 , is denied as premature. Based on Plaintiff's motion, Defendants have not yet been served or agreed to waive service. Plaintiff is also advised to review Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d). Signed on 06/23/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Thompson, Amy)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 6/17/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher P. Leritz on behalf of Plaintiff Acuity Insurance Company.(Leritz, Christopher)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for order to Shorten Service Response Time from 90 days to 30 days re #1 Complaint,, filed by Christopher P. Leritz on behalf of Acuity Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Leritz, Christopher)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Lock, Tania) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 MAP General Order). NEF regenerated to all parties (Lock, Tania).
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants filed by Christopher P. Leritz on behalf of Acuity Insurance Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6904274. Service due by 9/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy No. L44430, #3 Exhibit B - Errors & Omissions Policy L44430, #4 Exhibit C - Policy No. Z25624, #5 Exhibit D - Petition for Damages, #6 Exhibit E - Subcontractor Insurance/Hold Harmless Agreement)(Leritz, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acuity Insurance Company v. Ozark Cultured Stone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Custom Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mud Brothers Custom Exteriors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lenshyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Cultured Stone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mud Brothers Stucco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spillman Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Leritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?