Renzelmann v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tonya A. Renzelmann
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv04122
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Referring Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 7/30/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr., this case is reassigned to District Judge Gary A. Fenner for all further proceedings. The case number will now be 2:20-04122-CV-C-GAF. Signed on 7/16/20 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (James, Carrie)
July 15, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 07/15/2020 as Document No. 3-1, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. The document has been deleted as the motion for leave to file the document has not been granted. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 This document has been deleted. SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Traci L. Severs on behalf of Tonya A. Renzelmann Service due by 10/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Severs, Traci) Plaintiff's motion must be granted leave to file.
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Tonya A. Renzelmann. (Severs, Traci)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 First MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Traci L. Severs on behalf of Tonya A. Renzelmann. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Traci L. Severs added to party Tonya A. Renzelmann(pty:pla))(Severs, Traci) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Berner, Crystal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renzelmann v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya A. Renzelmann
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?