Marine Concepts, LLC v. Koppitz et al
Plaintiff: Marine Concepts, LLC
Defendant: Richard Chris Koppitz, Premium Custom Covers LLC and Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04129
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The second unopposed motions (Docs. #12 and #14 ) for extension through September 28, 2020 of Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint are GRANTED. However, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/9/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 10/2/2020. Signed on 9/11/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Alex Barrett on behalf of Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/25/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Barrett, Alex)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Alex Barrett on behalf of Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc. (Attorney Alex Barrett added to party Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barrett, Alex)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Joel R Samuels on behalf of Richard Chris Koppitz, Premium Custom Covers LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/25/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Joel R Samuels added to party Richard Chris Koppitz(pty:dft), Attorney Joel R Samuels added to party Premium Custom Covers LLC(pty:dft))(Samuels, Joel)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion (Doc. #10 ) to extend the time for Defendants Richard Chris Koppitz and Premium Custom Covers to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' answers or other responses to the complaint must be filed on or before 9/14/2020. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Marine Concepts, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Kernell, James)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion to extend the time for Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Lawrence Fabric Structures' answer or other response to the complaint must be filed on or before 9/14/2020. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Marine Concepts, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Kernell, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Marine Concepts, LLC. Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Kernell, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Marine Concepts, LLC. Premium Custom Covers LLC served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Kernell, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Marine Concepts, LLC. Richard Chris Koppitz served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Kernell, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 7/23/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
July 23, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Chris Koppitz, Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc., Premium Custom Covers LLC and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Berner, Crystal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. New case number is 2:20-cv-04029-cv-c-NKL. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (James, Carrie)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Chris Koppitz, Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc., Premium Custom Covers LLC filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Marine Concepts, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6958247. Service due by 10/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: US Patent No. 7,194,976, #2 Exhibit B: US Patent No. 8,601,971, #3 Exhibit C: US Patent No. 9,409,628, #4 Exhibit D: Dealer Agreement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kernell, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/24/2020 with corrected exhibit.) (Furtak, Rebecca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marine Concepts, LLC v. Koppitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Chris Koppitz
Represented By: Joel R Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Custom Covers LLC
Represented By: Joel R Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Fabric Structures, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Concepts, LLC
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Represented By: Kyle Duffy Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?