Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC v. New Residential Investment, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC
Defendant: US BANK, AS TRUSTEE FOR MANUFACTURED HOUSING CONTRACT SENIOR/SUBORDINATE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATE TRUST 1999-3, MORTGAGE CONTRACTING SERVICES, LLC, New Residential Investment, Corp. and US Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv04208
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #17 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Jack Thomas Hyde on behalf of Defendant Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 12/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Hyde, Jack)
November 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by John H. Edmiston on behalf of Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Edmiston, John)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 11/17/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM Courtroom 4A. Bench Trial set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 11/17/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/16/2020 as Document No. 14-1, Exhibit 1- Scheduling Order. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER And Discovery Plan by Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC, New Residential Investment, Corp., US Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 this document has been deleted )(Haddad, Mark).
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 Libert Asset Holdings, LLC's Answer to US Bank's Counterclaim ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC.(Edmiston, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC's Answer to New Residential Investment, Corp's Counterclaim ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC.(Edmiston, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Petition for Declaratory Judgment on behalf of Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC.(Hyde, Jack)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Jack Thomas Hyde on behalf of Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC (Attorney Jack Thomas Hyde added to party Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Hyde, Jack)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of Defendant US Bank, Counter Claimant US Bank.(Haddad, Mark)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Settlement Conference set for Video Teleconference on 2/16/2021 at 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. Video Teleconference link will be provided to the parties by email. Parties are directed to review the MAP General Order docketed in this case. All persons with actual settlement authority are required to attend the mediation. Additionally, if an insurance representative's approval is required to settle, they must attend. Parties are also directed to submit a combined mediation statement, of no more than three (3) pages, to angel_geiser@mow.uscourts.gov at least three (3) business days prior to the mediation. (Geiser, Angel)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC on behalf of US Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Attorney Mark Haddad added to party US Bank(pty:dft))(Haddad, Mark)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC on behalf of New Residential Investment, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Haddad, Mark)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.Proposed scheduling order due by 11/16/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 11/9/2020. Signed on 10/26/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 10/26/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Lock, Tania)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of Defendant New Residential Investment, Corp..(Haddad, Mark)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pettis County County, case number 20PT-CC00071, New Residential Investment, Corp.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7111606. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Haddad, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC v. New Residential Investment, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK, AS TRUSTEE FOR MANUFACTURED HOUSING CONTRACT SENIOR/SUBORDINATE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATE TRUST 1999-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE CONTRACTING SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Jack Thomas Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Investment, Corp.
Represented By: Mark Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Represented By: Mark Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Asset Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John H. Edmiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?