Patton v. Missouri Farm Bureau Federation et al
Plaintiff: Mr Joseph Patton and Joseph Patton
Defendant: Farm Bureau Brokerage, Farm Bureau New Horizons Insurance Company of Missouri, Missouri Farm Bureau Federation, Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri, Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company of Missouri, Director of the Missouri Department of Insurance, Missouri Farm Bureau Insurance Brokerage Inc., Missouri Farm Bureau Services, Inc. and Legacy Life Insurance Company of Missouri
Case Number: 2:2020cv04236
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 12/4/2020 as Document No. 2, 1-6, acknowledgement of service and summons. Summons must be submitted via the event email summons to be issued. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 12/4/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE executed Acknowledgement filed by Joseph Patton. (Attachments: # 1 SUMMONS, # 2 SUMMONS, # 3 SUMMONS, # 4 SUMMONS, # 5 SUMMONS, # 6 SUMMONS) Documents have been deleted (Brown, Roger).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Patton Joseph Patton. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7170795. Service due by 3/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Petition - Exhibit 1, #2 Petition - Exhibit B)(Brown, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Warren, Melissa). (Attachment 3 cover sheet replaced on 12/4/2020 reflect parties on the case) (Warren, Melissa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. Missouri Farm Bureau Federation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Joseph Patton
Represented By: Roger G Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Patton
Represented By: Roger G Brown
Represented By: William C. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Brokerage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau New Horizons Insurance Company of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Farm Bureau Federation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of the Missouri Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Farm Bureau Insurance Brokerage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Farm Bureau Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Life Insurance Company of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?