Mott v. Thermavant Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mott
Defendant: Thermavant Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04253
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 motion in part. The case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Boone County, Missouri. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Circuit Court of Boone County, Missouri, as required by 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his last known address. Signed on 02/16/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary) Modified on 2/17/2021 to reflect copy mailed to Jonathan Mott at 1420 Gypsy Moth Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 (Berner, Crystal).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 motion for extension of time of ADR Deadlines. Signed on 2/9/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) Modified on 2/9/2021 to reflect a copy of the order and NEF mailed to Jonathan Mott, 1420 Gypsy Moth Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 (Warren, Melissa).
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for extension of time of ADR Deadline filed by Narcisa Symank on behalf of Thermavant Technologies, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/19/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Symank, Narcisa)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION for order Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Narcisa Symank on behalf of Defendant Thermavant Technologies, LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Symank, Narcisa)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES on behalf of Plaintiff Jonathan Mott. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Ellis, Lindsey)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION for order Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of Plaintiff Jonathan Mott. Reply suggestions due by 2/4/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Ellis, Lindsey)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for order Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Narcisa Symank on behalf of Thermavant Technologies, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Symank, Narcisa)
December 30, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) Modified on 1/4/2021 to reflect a copy of this notice mailed via USPS to Jonathan Mott, 1420 Gypsy Moth Dr., Columbia, MO 65202(Woods, Gloria).
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/11/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 1/22/2021. Signed on 12/28/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) Modified on 12/28/2020 to reflect copy of this Order mailed to Jonathan Mott at 1420 Gypsy Moth Dr, Columbia, MO 65202. (Furtak, Rebecca).
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Narcisa Symank on behalf of Defendant Thermavant Technologies, LLC.(Symank, Narcisa)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa) Modified on 12/28/2020 to reflect NEF, notice of MAP assignment and MAP general order forwarded to Eddie LaReece Pittman, 315 West Elliot Rd Ste 107 #297, Tempe, AZ 85284. NEF regenerated (Warren, Melissa).
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL by Thermavant Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(Symank, Narcisa)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CIRCUIT COURT OF BOONE COUNTY, MISSOURI County, case number 20BA-CV03742, filed by Narcisa Symank on behalf of THERMAVANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMOWDC-7201013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - DOCKET SHEET & STATE FILE, #2 Civil Cover Sheet EXHIBIT B - COVER SHEET)(Symank, Narcisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mott v. Thermavant Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermavant Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Narcisa Symank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?