Holloway v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Holloway
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv04033
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Referring Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 motion to stay. Signed on 3/29/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This case number shall read 2:21-cv-4033-MDH. (Berner, Crystal). Modified on 3/11/2021 to correct case number (Berner, Crystal).
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to stay Proceedings and Supporting Memorandum filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Randi Kassan on behalf of Michelle Holloway (Attorney Randi Kassan added to party Michelle Holloway(pty:pla))(Kassan, Randi)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Enjolique A Lett for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporate and for C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Enjolique A. Lett to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7312540) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is terminated as counsel for C R Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Attorney Kara T. Stubbs remains as counsel for C R Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Signed on 3/2/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (VanGerpen, Lindsay)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 2/25/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (VanGerpen, Lindsay)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01063. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2021: #2 MDL 2641 Certified Docket Sheet) (Jones, Robin).
February 25, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff and defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 3/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa)
February 24, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1063-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16541709 filed by Michelle Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Enjolique A Lett
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Enjolique A Lett
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Holloway
Represented By: Robert J Fenstersheib
Represented By: Randi Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?