Schnellbacher v. Hubbell Power Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Schnellbacher
Defendant: Hubbell Power Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04039
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 38 U.S.C. ยง 4301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Hubbell Power Systems, Inc..(Liss, Jessica)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Andrew D Kinghorn on behalf of Hubbell Power Systems, Inc. (Attorney Andrew D Kinghorn added to party Hubbell Power Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kinghorn, Andrew)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica L. Liss on behalf of Hubbell Power Systems, Inc. (Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party Hubbell Power Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Liss, Jessica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michael Schnellbacher. Hubbell Power Systems, Inc. served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. (Werts, Todd)
March 2, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hubbell Power Systems, Inc and emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Berner, Crystal)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa) Modified on 3/1/2021 to reflect MAP assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. NEF regenerated to parties (Warren, Melissa).
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hubbell Power Systems, Inc. filed by Todd C. Werts on behalf of Michael Schnellbacher. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7306291. Service due by 5/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werts, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schnellbacher v. Hubbell Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbell Power Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Represented By: Andrew D Kinghorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schnellbacher
Represented By: Anthony Meyer
Represented By: Bradford B. Lear
Represented By: Todd C. Werts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?