McGhee et al v. Khalilov et al
Plaintiff: Kevin McGhee and Jenise McGhee
Defendant: Zokhirkul Khalilov and Eco Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04048
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/21/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 5/28/2021. The parties must follow the formatting of Judge Epps' example scheduling and trial order posted at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/epps. Signed on 04/20/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Geiser, Angel)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge Assignment Returned by plaintiffs, Jenise McGhee, Kevin McGhee and defendants, Eco Trucking, LLC, and Zokhirkul Khalilov. Jurisdiction by magistrate judge accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Berner, Crystal)
April 1, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to defendants: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 4/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint on behalf of Eco Trucking, LLC.(Baty, Lee)
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint on behalf of Zokhirkul Khalilov.(Baty, Lee)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Evan Mitchell Schodowski on behalf of Eco Trucking, LLC, Zokhirkul Khalilov (Attorney Evan Mitchell Schodowski added to party Eco Trucking, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Mitchell Schodowski added to party Zokhirkul Khalilov(pty:dft))(Schodowski, Evan)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Eco Trucking, LLC, Zokhirkul Khalilov (Attorney Lee M. Baty added to party Eco Trucking, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lee M. Baty added to party Zokhirkul Khalilov(pty:dft))(Baty, Lee)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy Michael Cronin on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Cronin, Timothy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Eco Trucking, LLC served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Cronin, Timothy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Zokhirkul Khalilov served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Cronin, Timothy)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 03/10/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by John G. Simon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney John G. Simon added to party Jenise McGhee(pty:pla), Attorney John G. Simon added to party Kevin McGhee(pty:pla))(Simon, John)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth Criswell McNulty on behalf of Jenise McGhee, Kevin McGhee (Attorney Elizabeth Criswell McNulty added to party Jenise McGhee(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Criswell McNulty added to party Kevin McGhee(pty:pla))(McNulty, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy Michael Cronin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7325086. Service due by 6/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Ex 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronin, Timothy)
March 10, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eco Trucking, LLC and Zokhirkul Khalilov. Summons forwarded to Plaintiff by email for service. (Warren, Melissa)
March 10, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 3/31/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGhee et al v. Khalilov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McGhee
Represented By: Elizabeth Criswell McNulty
Represented By: Timothy Michael Cronin
Represented By: John G. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenise McGhee
Represented By: Elizabeth Criswell McNulty
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: Timothy Michael Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zokhirkul Khalilov
Represented By: Evan Mitchell Schodowski
Represented By: Lee M. Baty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Evan Mitchell Schodowski
Represented By: Lee M. Baty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?