Gilbert v. Estes Express Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kerry Gilbert
Defendant: Estes Express Lines, Inc. and Randall Ross
Case Number: 2:2021cv04049
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Randall Ross.(Fritz, Kevin)
April 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Daniel Mannion on behalf of Randall Ross (Attorney Daniel Mannion added to party Randall Ross(pty:dft))(Mannion, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance by Kevin L. Fritz on behalf of Randall Ross (Attorney Kevin L. Fritz added to party Randall Ross(pty:dft))(Fritz, Kevin)
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 04/12/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2022 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2021. Signed on 04/12/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania)
April 6, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Randall Ross. Summons returned to Plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Estes Express Lines, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Gage Fletcher on behalf of Plaintiff Kerry Gilbert.(Fletcher, Gage)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kevin L. Fritz on behalf of Defendant Estes Express Lines, Inc..(Fritz, Kevin)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Settlement Conference set for Video Teleconference on 6/17/2021 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. Parties are directed to review the MAP General Order docketed in this case. All persons with actual settlement authority are required to attend the mediation. Additionally, if an insurance representative's approval is required to settle, they must attend. Parties are also directed to submit a combined mediation statement, of no more than three (3) pages, to angel_geiser@mow.uscourts.gov at least three (3) business days prior to the mediation. (Geiser, Angel)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/5/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/29/2021. Signed on 03/15/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 03/15/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Daniel Mannion on behalf of Estes Express Lines, Inc. (Attorney Daniel Mannion added to party Estes Express Lines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mannion, Daniel)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Estes Express Lines, Inc..(Fritz, Kevin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Estes Express Lines, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kevin L. Fritz on behalf of Defendant Estes Express Lines, Inc..(Fritz, Kevin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff by Estes Express Lines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Fritz, Kevin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Callaway County Circuit Court County, case number 21CW-CV00191, filed by Kevin L. Fritz on behalf of Estes Express Lines, Inc.. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7325651. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fritz, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Estes Express Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estes Express Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Mannion
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Ross
Represented By: Daniel Mannion
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Gilbert
Represented By: Gage Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?