Holtcamp v. Stringer
Petitioner: Jackie L Holtcamp
Respondent: Mark Stringer
Case Number: 2:2021cv04105
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 16 PETITIONER'S LETTER to the Court filed by Jackie L Holtcamp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (CLERK'S NOTE: Letter and exhibit received with blank 2254 form.)(Davies, Cindy)
June 23, 2021 Filing 15 PETITIONER'S LETTERS to the Court and clerk filed by Jackie L Holtcamp.(Willis, Kathy)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (CLERK'S NOTE: All documents pertaining to this case are on CM/ECF. Nothing will be sent to the Court of Appeals.) (Davies, Cindy)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by July 20, 2021, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (Davies, Cindy)
June 22, 2021 USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit is 21-2368 for #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Jackie L Holtcamp. (Davies, Cindy)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Willis, Kathy)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that Petitioner is denied leave to appeal in forma pauperis and that the Clerk of the Court electronically forward this case to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit for further processing of Petitioner's appeal. Signed on 6/22/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Willis, Kathy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL filed by Jackie L Holtcamp. (Davies, Cindy)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDER that Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #2 ) is denied without prejudice, because it does not yet appear that an evidentiary hearing is required in this matter or that appointment of counsel is required for the fair presentation of Petitioner's claims. See Hoggard v. Purkett, 29 F.3d 469, 471 (8th Cir. 1994) (Where an evidentiary hearing is not required, the district court retains discretion to determine whether counsel should be appointed.). Signed on June 9, 2021 by Senior District Judge Nanette K Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that: (1) petitioner is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in this petition on or before June 23, 2021; (2) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail petitioner a copy of this Order along with court-approved forms to prepare his petition; and (3) FAILURE OF PETITIONER TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT FURTHER WARNING TO PETITIONER. Signed on 6/9/2021 by Senior District Judge Nanette K Laughrey. (CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this Order along with court-approved forms mailed to Petitioner as directed.)(Willis, Kathy)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 PETITIONER'S REQUEST filed by Jackie L Holtcamp.(Davies, Cindy)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 PETITIONER'S EXHIBITS and Letter to the Court filed by Jackie L Holtcamp. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge #2 Letter to Clerk)(Willis, Kathy)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 PETITIONER'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jackie L Holtcamp.(Willis, Kathy)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for order for name change filed by Jackie L Holtcamp. (Willis, Kathy)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Jackie L Holtcamp. (Willis, Kathy)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jackie L Holtcamp (Attachment: #1 Petition Exhibits)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtcamp v. Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jackie L Holtcamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?