Baker v. Stange
Petitioner: Cody Marshall Baker
Respondent: Bill Stange
Case Number: 2:2021cv04127
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #8 ) is granted. Respondent shall file a response on or before September 1, 2021.Signed on July 30, 2021 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time filed by Patrick Logan on behalf of Bill Stange. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Logan, Patrick)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Patrick Logan on behalf of Bill Stange (Attorney Patrick Logan added to party Bill Stange(pty:res))(Logan, Patrick)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that: (1) Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and (2) Respondent answer Petitioner's allegations and show cause on or before 8/2/2021, why the relief Petitioner seeks should not be granted. Signed on 7/1/2021 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00087.
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: Western District of Missouri ( Case to be transferred after 6/30/2021.)Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 06/15/2021. (CMH) [Transferred from moed on 7/1/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) [Transferred from moed on 7/1/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) by Petitioner Cody Marshall Baker. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(CSG) [Transferred from moed on 7/1/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (CSG) [Transferred from moed on 7/1/2021.]
June 14, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Jun 14 17:00:59 CDT 2021 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 7/1/2021.]
June 14, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CSG) [Transferred from moed on 7/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Stange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Stange
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Represented By: Patrick Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cody Marshall Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?