Bemiss et al v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Roy Bemiss, Quinton Goodall, Maurice Joseph, Lawrence Allen, Lydia Gridley, Robert Kelley, Sharon Wallace, Joseph Sirianni and Daniel Lincoln
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC and PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04173
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-1, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Western District of Pennsylvania to be included in MDL No. 3014. Signed on 10/20/2021. Case electronically transferred. (Warren, Melissa)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Philips North America LLC served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Ross, Inez)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Philips RS North America LLC served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (Ross, Inez)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service unexecuted by Robert Kelley, Maurice Joseph, Sharon Wallace, Daniel Lincoln, Quinton Goodall, Joseph Sirianni, Lawrence Allen, Roy Bemiss, Lydia Gridley as to Philips North America LLC. (Ross, Inez)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Koninklijke Philips N.V. served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Ross, Inez)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE at #6 was entered in error and has been deleted. The Honorable Willie J. Epps, Jr. remains the presiding judge in this case. Signed on 10/12/2021 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 (DELETED; ENTERED IN ERROR) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Willie J. Epps, Jr., this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge M. Douglas Harpool for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 2:21-04173-CV-C-MDH. Signed on 10/12/2021 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri) Modified on 10/12/2021 (Moore, Terri).
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs filed by Inez Johnson Ross on behalf of Plaintiffs Lawrence Allen, Roy Bemiss, Quinton Goodall, Lydia Gridley, Maurice Joseph, Robert Kelley, Daniel Lincoln, Joseph Sirianni, Sharon Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Ross, Inez)
September 29, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal)
September 9, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal)
September 7, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 9/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 09/03/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION to certify class filed by Inez Johnson Ross on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ross, Inez)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Inez Johnson Ross on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7569292. Service due by 12/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ross, Inez)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bemiss et al v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Bemiss
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinton Goodall
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Joseph
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Allen
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Gridley
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kelley
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Wallace
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sirianni
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lincoln
Represented By: Inez Johnson Ross
Represented By: James G Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?