Black v. Falkenrath
Petitioner: Brent Black
Respondent: Doris Falkenrath
Case Number: 2:2021cv04207
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered by Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff is ordered to respond to Defendant's show cause order response, Doc. #9 , and explain why his habeas petition should not be denied. Plaintiff's response must be filed by December 30, 2021. Signed on 12/14/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Vandegriff, Joseph) Modified on 12/15/2021 to correct response due date. Regenerated NEF to all Parties (Vandegriff, Joseph).
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to order re 7 Order to Show Cause,,, filed by Patrick Logan on behalf of Respondent Doris Falkenrath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (DA Brief), #2 Exhibit B (State's DA Brief), #3 Exhibit C (DA Opinion), #4 Exhibit D (DA Legal File), #5 Exhibit E (PCR Brief), #6 Exhibit F (State's PCR Brief), #7 Exhibit G (PCR Memo Opinion), #8 Exhibit H (PCR Transcript), #9 Exhibit I (Trial Transcript), #10 Exhibit J (PCR Mandate))(Related document(s) 7 ) (Logan, Patrick)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Patrick Logan on behalf of Doris Falkenrath (Attorney Patrick Logan added to party Doris Falkenrath(pty:res))(Logan, Patrick)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. A Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus was filed by petitioner on October 4, 2021. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that respondent is directed to answer petitioner's allegations and show cause by December 13, 2021, why the relief petitioner seeks should not be granted. A copy of this order shall be mailed to the Office of the Missouri Attorney General Habeas Division, 221 W. High Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101. Signed on 11/12/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Vandegriff, Joseph) Modified on 11/12/2021 to reflect NEF mailed to Office of the Missouri Attorney General Habeas Division, 221 W. High Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101 (Warren, Melissa).
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01181.
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. Case to be transferred after 10/28/2021. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/14/2021. (AFO) [Transferred from moed on 10/29/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/14/2021. (AFO) [Transferred from moed on 10/29/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) [Transferred from moed on 10/29/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AMOEDC-8901724.) by Petitioner Brent Black. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gipson, Kent)[Transferred from moed on 10/29/2021.]
October 4, 2021 ***A Pro Se Case note. Is the complaint signed? - Yes. Is the complaint filed on the required form? - Yes. Is the filing fee paid? - Yes. Is there a motion for IFP? - No. Is there an inmate account statement or financial Affidavit? - No. Are there any Judge conflicts? - No. Are there any previously filed cases? - No. Is there correct venue alleged? - Yes. Has the plaintiff alleged capacity of the defendants? - Unknown. Is plaintiff requesting a TRO? - No. Is this a death penalty case? - No. Is the petitioner requesting relief re: Johnson? - No. (JKL) [Transferred from moed on 10/29/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JKL) [Transferred from moed on 10/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Falkenrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brent Black
Represented By: Kent E. Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doris Falkenrath
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Represented By: Patrick Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?