Billups v. AT&T Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Billups
Defendant: AT&T Corporation, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, Kory Vaughan and AT&T Corp.
Case Number: 2:2022cv04116
Filed: August 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #17 motion to remand. The case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Pettis County, Missouri. Signed on 1/19/23 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to file Right to Sue Letter filed by Jonathan M. Soper on behalf of Christopher L. Billups. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter)(Soper, Jonathan)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #17 MOTION to remand Ptf's Reply ISO Motion to Remand filed by Jonathan M. Soper on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher L. Billups. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Soper, Jonathan)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #27 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply in Support of Motion to Remand, #17 MOTION to remand Plaintiff's Reply suggestions due by 10/14/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 10/4/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Jonathan M. Soper on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Soper, Jonathan)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative for Summary Judgment. Defendants Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, and Kory Vaughn's Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lucas Andrew Klein. (Klein, Lucas) Modified on 9/26/2022 to reflect correct docket event and remove deadlines. NEF regenerated (Warren, Melissa).
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #17 MOTION to remand Union Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Loretta K. Haggard on behalf of Defendants Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, Kory Vaughan. Reply suggestions due by 10/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Haggard, Loretta)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendants AT&T Corp., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 joint motion to continue Rule 26 Conference, Submission of Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan, and Referral to Outside Mediation. The deadlines of the Rule 16 Notice (Doc. 6) are terminated. The Court will issue a new Rule 16 Notice after the Court rules on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. 17)Signed on 9/13/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 motion for extension of time to file response/reply as to , #17 MOTION to remand , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative for Summary Judgment Suggestions in opposition/response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 17) due by 9/23/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Reply suggestions to Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 11) due by 9/23/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court.. Signed on 9/13/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #18 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #17 MOTION to remand , #19 Suggestions in Opposition to Motion, filed by Loretta K. Haggard on behalf of Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, Kory Vaughan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/26/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 , #17 , #19 ) (Haggard, Loretta)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint MOTION to continue Rule 26 Conference, Submission of Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan, and Referral to Outside Mediation filed by Loretta K. Haggard on behalf of Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, Kory Vaughan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/23/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Haggard, Loretta)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Jonathan M. Soper on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher L. Billups. Reply suggestions due by 9/16/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Soper, Jonathan)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #17 MOTION to remand filed by Jonathan M. Soper on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher L. Billups. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Soper, Jonathan)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to remand filed by Jonathan M. Soper on behalf of Christopher L. Billups. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/16/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Soper, Jonathan)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jonathan M. Soper on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher L. Billups. Reply suggestions due by 9/16/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Soper, Jonathan)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative for Summary Judgment, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by One Week
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative for Summary Judgment, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by One Week filed by Jonathan M. Soper on behalf of Christopher L. Billups. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 , #8 ) (Soper, Jonathan)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendants AT&T Corp., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Boatright, Daniel)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Loretta K. Haggard on behalf of Defendants Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, Kory Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex 1 Vaughan Declaration, #2 Affidavit Ex 2 Stuart Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Haggard, Loretta)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Loretta K. Haggard on behalf of Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, Kory Vaughan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Haggard, Loretta)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Loretta K. Haggard on behalf of Defendant Communication Workers of America.(Haggard, Loretta)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendants AT&T Corp., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of AT&T Corp., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boatright, Daniel)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/23/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 9/8/2022. Signed on 8/9/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of filing - Defendants AT&T Corp. and Southwestern Bell Telephone Company's Joinder in and Consent to Removal - by AT&T Corporation, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Boatright, Daniel)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Lucas Andrew Klein on behalf of Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, Kory Vaughan (Attorney Lucas Andrew Klein added to party Communication Workers of America(pty:dft), Attorney Lucas Andrew Klein added to party Dustin Stuart(pty:dft), Attorney Lucas Andrew Klein added to party Kory Vaughan(pty:dft))(Klein, Lucas)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Loretta K. Haggard on behalf of Communication Workers of America, Dustin Stuart, Kory Vaughan (Haggard, Loretta)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pettis County, case number 22PT-CC00084, filed by Loretta K. Haggard. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8048320. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kory Vaughan, #3 Exhibit C - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Dustin Stuart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haggard, Loretta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billups v. AT&T Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Billups
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Soper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communication Workers of America
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Klein
Represented By: Loretta K. Haggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Stuart
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Klein
Represented By: Loretta K. Haggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kory Vaughan
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Klein
Represented By: Loretta K. Haggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?