Haynes v. Neiger
Plaintiff: Carol A. Haynes
Defendant: Cameron D. Neiger
Case Number: 2:2022cv04121
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2022 09:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Conference call information previously provided in Document No. #4
October 3, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Hrant Norsigian on behalf of Plaintiff Carol A. Haynes.(Norsigian, Hrant)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Hrant Norsigian for Carol A. Haynes allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
September 30, 2022 Filing 16 Motion to allow Hrant Norsigian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8125144) filed by Elkin L Kistner on behalf of Carol A. Haynes. (Kistner, Elkin)
September 30, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Elkin L Kistner on behalf of Carol A. Haynes (Attorney Elkin L Kistner added to party Carol A. Haynes(pty:pla))(Kistner, Elkin)
September 30, 2022 Filing 14 Before this Court is #11 MOTION TO WITHDRAW NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PETITION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Court hereby grants the motion and the #11 Motion to allow Hrant Norsigian to appear pro hac vice and #10 Notice of Appearance are hereby withdrawn. Signed on 9/30/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 28, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to withdraw document #11 Motion to allow Hrant Norsigian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8125144), #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Elkin L Kistner on behalf of Cameron D. Neiger. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 , #10 ) (Kistner, Elkin)
September 28, 2022 Filing 12 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOT held on 9/28/2022. Court takes up issue of Application to Appear PHV and entry of appearance by Elkin Kistner. Hrant Norsigian advises that the filing of the entry of appearance by Elkin Kistner as counsel for defendant was in error and will be amended to properly reflect entry as counsel for plaintiff. Court will reschedule the Scheduling Conference once the request to appear PHV and entry of appearance have been corrected and the Motion to Appear PHV has been approved. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Hrant Norsigian. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Brian Shank. Time in court: 10:00 am to 10:10 am. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 27, 2022 Filing 11 WITHDRAWN 9/30/22 SEE DOC. 14 Motion to allow Hrant Norsigian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8125144) filed by Elkin L Kistner on behalf of Cameron D. Neiger. (Kistner, Elkin) Modified on 9/30/2022 (Diefenbach, Tracy).
September 27, 2022 Filing 10 WITHDRAWN 9/30/22 SEE DOC. 14 NOTICE of appearance by Elkin L Kistner on behalf of Cameron D. Neiger (Attorney Elkin L Kistner added to party Cameron D. Neiger(pty:dft))(Kistner, Elkin) Modified on 9/30/2022 (Diefenbach, Tracy).
September 27, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cameron D. Neiger filed by Brian R Shank on behalf of Defendant Cameron D. Neiger.(Shank, Brian)
September 23, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cameron D. Neiger filed by Brian R Shank on behalf of Defendant Cameron D. Neiger.(Shank, Brian)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Cameron D. Neiger. (Shank, Brian)
August 24, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Cameron D. Neiger.(Shank, Brian)
August 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Parties are directed to review the MAP General Order docketed in this case. All persons with actual settlement authority are required to attend the mediation. Additionally, if an insurance representative's approval is required to settle, they must attend. Parties are also directed to submit a combined mediation statement, of no more than three (3) pages, to angel_geiser@mow.uscourts.gov at least three (3) business days prior to the mediation. Mediation set for video teleconference on 11/29/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Geiser, Angel)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/21/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2022 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 8/18/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
August 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Cameron Neiger (Shank, Brian)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Callaway County, case number 22CW-CV00537, filed by Brian R Shank. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8064959. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 State Court Petition State Court Docket Sheet and Filings)(Shank, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Neiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Haynes
Represented By: Hrant Norsigian
Represented By: Elkin L Kistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron D. Neiger
Represented By: Brian R Shank
Represented By: Elkin L Kistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?