MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv04139
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 8, 2022 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Michael J. Patton(Shearer, Richard)
November 7, 2022 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard F. Shearer on behalf of Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Shearer, Richard)
November 7, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard F. Shearer on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/21/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shearer, Richard)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Steven M. Levy for Shelter Mutual Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
November 4, 2022 Filing 17 Motion to allow Steven M. Levy to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8181293) filed by Richard F. Shearer on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Shearer, Richard)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Janice H. Ziegler for Shelter Mutual Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
November 4, 2022 Filing 15 Motion to allow Janice H. Ziegler to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8181079) filed by Richard F. Shearer on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Shearer, Richard)
November 2, 2022 Filing 14 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 11/02/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/7/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 7/28/2023. Signed on 11/02/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania)
November 2, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/1/2022 as Document No. 12-1, proposed scheduling order. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
November 1, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Joint Discovery Plan and Schedule Report by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order This document has been deleted. )(Shearer, Richard)
October 19, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by John C Whitfield on behalf of Plaintiff MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC.(Whitfield, John)
October 19, 2022 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Richard F. Shearer on behalf of Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(Shearer, Richard)
October 12, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Brian Richard McGinley on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Attorney Brian Richard McGinley added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft))(McGinley, Brian)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed scheduling order due by 11/1/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 10/25/2022. Signed on 10/11/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendant's #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before 11/7/2022. Signed on 10/7/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Gassen, Austin)
October 6, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Richard F. Shearer on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Shearer, Richard)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Richard F. Shearer on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Attorney Richard F. Shearer added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Shearer, Richard)
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Affidavit of Service by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Whitfield, John)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 09/19/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company filed by John C. Whitfield on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8109961. Service due by 12/15/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Whitfield, John)
September 16, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 09/16/2022 as Document No. 1-4, Summons. The summons attached to the complaint has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any summons to be issued are to be emailed to the Court. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
September 16, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. Summons directed to plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Represented By: John C Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Richard McGinley
Represented By: Steven Levy
Represented By: Richard F. Shearer
Represented By: Janice H. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?