Kirk v. Schaeffler Group USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jodelle L. Kirk
Defendant: Schaeffler Group USA, Inc., FAG Holding, LLC, Wayne Allison and FAG Bearings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv05032
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Joplin Office
County: Newton
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2016 579 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 555 Defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law. Signed on 7/14/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
July 13, 2016 578 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 557 Defendants' motion for new trial. Signed on 7/13/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
June 2, 2016 569 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 552 motion to reconsider sanctions. Section IV of the Court's June 15, 2015, Order imposing sanctions is vacated. Briefing due 6/30/16; reply briefs due 7/21/16. On or before 6/16/16, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a list of any previous instances where they have been sanctioned for a discovery violation. Signed on 6/2/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
March 9, 2016 491 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 489 Plaintiff's motion for judgment as a matter of law, granting in part Defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law. Signed on March 9, 2016 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Lehr, Jonathan)
March 7, 2016 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's objection to Don Van Dyke's testimony. Signed on March 7, 2016 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Lehr, Jonathan) Modified on 3/7/2016 - document replaced to correct signature date (Francis, Alexandra).
February 28, 2016 467 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 406 motion to strike. Signed on February 28, 2016 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Lehr, Jonathan)
February 26, 2016 459 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 334 Defendants' First Motion in Limine. Signed on 2/26/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
February 24, 2016 454 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Ruling on Defendants' Remaining Motions in Limine 337 343 344 349 . Signed on 2/24/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
February 12, 2016 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 334 335 336 338 339 340 341 342 345 346 347 348 350 351 Defendants' motions in limine. Signed on 2/12/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
January 29, 2016 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 386 motion for reconsideration. Signed on January 29, 2016 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Lehr, Jonathan)
January 7, 2016 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 278 Defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed on 1/7/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
December 22, 2015 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 288 motion to strike. Signed on December 22, 2015 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Lehr, Jonathan)
January 26, 2015 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Defendants' motion for sanctions. Defense counsel shall file an affidavit on or before February 2, 2015, stating the amount of reasonable attorneys' fees incurred in making this motion. Plaintiff's counsel shall then have seven days to file any response. If Plaintiff's counsel files a response, Defendant shall have seven days to file a reply. Signed on 1/26/15 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
January 20, 2015 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 40 Plaintiff's motion on collateral estoppel. Signed on 1/20/15 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
June 20, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 motion to quash. Signed on June 20, 2014 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Lehr, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk v. Schaeffler Group USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodelle L. Kirk
Represented By: Andrew K Smith
Represented By: Jonathan M. Soper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schaeffler Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Wade P. K. Carr
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAG Holding, LLC
Represented By: Wade P. K. Carr
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAG Bearings, LLC
Represented By: Wade P. K. Carr
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?