Blount et al v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Ranch Enterprises, LLC f/k/a Santa Fe Ranch Holdings, LLC, Patricia Blount and Santa Fe Ranch Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05040
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company filed by Judson B. Poppen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Poppen, Judson)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition or, Alternatively, for a More Definite Statement (Doc. #4) is granted in part and denied in part. To the extent Defendant moves for a more definite statement, the motion is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint on or before July 11, 2019, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e). Signed on 6/27/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Beck, Douglas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or, Alternatively, For A More Definite Statement filed by Douglas S. Beck on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Beck, Douglas)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or, Alternatively, For A More Definite Statement filed by Judson B. Poppen on behalf of Plaintiffs Patricia Blount, Santa Fe Ranch Enterprises, LLC f/k/a Santa Fe Ranch Holdings, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 6/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Attorney Judson B. Poppen added to party Santa Fe Ranch Enterprises, LLC f/k/a Santa Fe Ranch Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Poppen, Judson)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/26/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 6/7/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Douglas S. Beck on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.(Beck, Douglas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or, Alternatively, For A More Definite Statement filed by Douglas S. Beck on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Beck, Douglas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or, Alternatively, For A More Definite Statement filed by Douglas S. Beck on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Beck, Douglas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal of Civil Action With the Circuit Court by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Beck, Douglas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Missouri County, case number 19LW-CC00041, filed by Douglas S. Beck on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6325432. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit Santa Fe Florida Secretary of State Filings, #3 Exhibit North Carolina State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Beck, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount et al v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Ranch Enterprises, LLC f/k/a Santa Fe Ranch Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Ryan D Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Blount
Represented By: Judson B. Poppen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Ranch Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Judson B. Poppen
Represented By: Ryan D Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas S. Beck
Represented By: Bradley S. Thomas
Represented By: W. Clark Richardson
Represented By: Bradley Scott Thomas
Represented By: William Clark Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?