Klein v. CSM Foreclosure Trustee Corp., Successor Trustee et al
Plaintiff: Diane L. Klein
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and CSM Foreclosure Trustee Corp., Successor Trustee
Case Number: 3:2019cv05045
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020. Teleconference set for 7/17/2020 11:30 AM. Pretrial Conference via teleconference set for 8/3/2020 10:00 AM. Bench Trial set for 8/18/2020, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 8/22/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Diane L. Klein. (Cole, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Cole, David)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #14 Previously, this case was selected for inclusion in the Court's Mediation and Assessment Program ("MAP"). (Doc. 3.) Pending before the Court is the Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Mediation Deadline. This Motion is DENIED, because it is inconsistent with the MAP General Order (see 3-1). As set out in section V, paragraph C of that Order, this request should be directed in the first instance to the MAP Administrator. Signed on 8/15/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for extension of time for mediation deadline filed by Joel Thomason on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Thomason, Joel)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT CSM FORECLOSURE TRUSTEE CORP. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court concludes that CSM has been fraudulently joined, so its citizenship is disregarded and the Court has jurisdiction in this matter. CSM is dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 8/15/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association.(Thomason, Joel)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court directs Plaintiff to show cause why the Court should not conclude that CSM has been fraudulently joined Plaintiff shall respond on or before 8/8/2019. Signed on 7/24/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Attorney Donald L. Cupps' Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. Signed on 7/10/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff filed by Donald L. Cupps on behalf of Diane L. Klein. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cupps, Donald)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by David A. Cole on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney David A. Cole added to party Diane L. Klein(pty:pla))(Cole, David)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/16/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 8/2/2019. Signed on 7/2/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. U.S. Bank National Association answer due 8/2/2019. Signed on 6/27/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer to the Complaint (Unopposed) filed by Joel Thomason on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thomason, Joel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Filing by U.S. Bank National Association re #1 Notice of Removal, (Thomason, Joel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/25/2019 as Document No. 1-1, Exhibit A - State Court File. Replaced, to correct scanning errors. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Interest by U.S. Bank National Association re #1 Notice of Removal, (Thomason, Joel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lawrence County Circuit Court County, case number 19LW-00067, filed by Joel Thomason on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6371042. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Zillow Report, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomason, Joel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/25/2019) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. CSM Foreclosure Trustee Corp., Successor Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane L. Klein
Represented By: Donald L. Cupps
Represented By: David A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Joel Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSM Foreclosure Trustee Corp., Successor Trustee
Represented By: Robert Spickerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?