Jarrett v. Nguyen et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Jarrett
Defendant: Luong Nguyen and Thao Le
Case Number: 3:2019cv05052
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 9/9/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2020 02:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for five days beginning 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020., Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2019., Discovery Motions due by 2/7/2020., Status Reports due by 11/8/2019 and 1/7/2020. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Signed on 9/9/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Thomas Halloran on behalf of Defendants Thao Le, Luong Nguyen.(Halloran, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew L Bretz on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Jarrett.(Bretz, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Anthony Jarrett. (Bretz, Matthew) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/28/2019) (Furtak, Rebecca).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/23/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/6/2019. Signed on 8/7/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Thao Le.(Attorney Michael Thomas Halloran added to party Thao Le(pty:dft))(Halloran, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Luong Nguyen.(Attorney Michael Thomas Halloran added to party Luong Nguyen(pty:dft))(Halloran, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Anthony Jarrett. Luong Nguyen served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Bretz, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Anthony Jarrett. Thao Le served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Bretz, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thao Le, Luong Nguyen. (Woods, Gloria)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS..Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew L Bretz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6398116. Service due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bretz, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarrett v. Nguyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luong Nguyen
Represented By: Michael Thomas Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thao Le
Represented By: Michael Thomas Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jarrett
Represented By: Matthew L Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?