Howard v. HBC Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Howard
Defendant: HBC Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05068
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Before the Court are Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. #5) and Defendant's Motion for Appointed Counsel (Doc. #6). It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. #5) is GRANTED. Defendant's Answer (Doc. #4) is deemed stricken in its entirety. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Appointed Counsel (Doc. #6) is DENIED. Defendant shall obtain counsel and file an answer through counsel on or before December 30, 2019. Signed on 11/13/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Copy of this Order has been mailed to: HBC Services, Inc.c/o Charles B. Henry, Jr.6888 Cheswick DriveRiverdale, GA 30269 (Ellis, Lindsey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Charles B. Henry Jr. for HBC Services, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/23/2019 as Document No. 5, Motion to Strike. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word or WordPerfect format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to strike 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of William Howard. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Molner, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by William Howard. HBC Services, Inc. served on 9/21/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Molner, Mark)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HBC Services, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HBC Services, Inc. filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of William Howard. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6494394. Service due by 12/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molner, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. HBC Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Howard
Represented By: Mark D. Molner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?