Clevenger v. The Hertz Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Clevenger
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation and Dustin Dwyer
Case Number: 3:2020cv05001
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #9 unopposed motion for extension of time. Counsel for Defendant Hertz confirmed by email to Chambers that it does not oppose the requested extension. Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition to Defendant Hertz's motion to dismiss is due 3/9/2020. Signed on 2/4/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Phillips, Caleb)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to continue filed by Charles J. Sticklen, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sticklen, Charles)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 unopposed motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition to Defendant Hertz's motion to dismiss is due 2/6/2020. Signed on 1/22/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Phillips, Caleb)
January 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Charles J. Sticklen, Jr on behalf of Patricia Clevenger. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sticklen, Charles)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kyle N Roehler on behalf of Defendant The Hertz Corporation. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Roehler, Kyle)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kyle N Roehler on behalf of The Hertz Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Roehler, Kyle)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 2/5/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/19/2020. Signed on January 6, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Megan E McCullough on behalf of The Hertz Corporation (McCullough, Megan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jasper County, MO County, case number 19AO-CC00277, filed by Kyle N Roehler on behalf of The Hertz Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6650024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roehler, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clevenger v. The Hertz Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Clevenger
Represented By: Charles J. Sticklen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Kyle N Roehler
Represented By: Megan E McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Dwyer
Represented By: Kyle N Roehler
Represented By: Megan E McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?