Gold v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gold
Defendant: United States of America and David Towers
Case Number: 3:2020cv05027
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Party (Doc. #8) is, with Plaintiff having no opposition, GRANTED. Defendant David Towers is DISMISSED as a defendant in this case. Plaintiff's claims remain pending against Defendant United States of America. Signed on 4/23/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to motion re #8 MOTION to dismiss party Motion to Dismiss Defendant David Towers Leaving the United States as the Proper and Sole Party-Defendant filed by Roger Alan Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer Gold. Reply suggestions due by 5/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnson, Roger)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss party Motion to Dismiss Defendant David Towers Leaving the United States as the Proper and Sole Party-Defendant filed by Cynthia J. Hyde on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hyde, Cynthia)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Cynthia J. Hyde on behalf of United States of America (Attorney Cynthia J. Hyde added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Hyde, Cynthia)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/7/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 4/24/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m., before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. See order for conference call-in numbers. Signed on 4/13/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Paul D. Link on behalf of David Towers (Attorney Paul D. Link added to party David Towers(pty:dft))(Link, Paul)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of David Towers.(McCullough, Megan)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Megan E McCullough on behalf of David Towers (Attorney Megan E McCullough added to party David Towers(pty:dft))(McCullough, Megan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jennifer Gold. David Towers served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Johnson, Roger)
February 26, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
February 26, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Towers and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Roger Alan Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6745501. Service due by 5/26/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gold
Represented By: Roger Alan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia J. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Towers
Represented By: Paul D. Link
Represented By: Megan E McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?