Forrester v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Forrester
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC, Cook Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv05049
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-89, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Southern District of Indiana to be included in MDL No. 2570. Signed on 6/17/2020. Case electronically transferred. (Furtak, Rebecca)
June 9, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 6/25/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/4/2020 as Document Nos. 1-2, 1-3, 1-4, Summonses. The documents have been deleted. Summonses should be completed, with the case number, and emailed to Spfdgen@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James J Rosemergy on behalf of Jordan Forrester. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6883790. Service due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Rosemergy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forrester v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Forrester
Represented By: James J Rosemergy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?