Sanders v. Hoeft et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Renee Sanders
Defendant: Stone County Sheriff's Department and Aaron Hoeft
Case Number: 3:2020cv05057
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00737.
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that the Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(b). ( Case to be transferred after 6/30/2020.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/16/2020. (JMP) [Transferred from moed on 6/30/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 6/30/2020.]
June 5, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jun 5 13:00:58 CDT 2020 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 6/30/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 6/30/2020.]
June 5, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 6/30/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Aaron Hoeft, Stone County Sheriff's Department Jury Demand, filed by Sarah Renee Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Judge Assignment Label, #4 Envelope)(DJO) [Transferred from moed on 6/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Hoeft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Hoeft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Renee Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?