Nenneman v. Experian Information Solutions Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Candice Nenneman
Defendant: Trans Union LLC, First Community Bank and Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05067
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Please note the new case number: 20-5067-CV-SW-BCW. (Melvin, Greg)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/6/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/20/2020. Signed on 9/22/2020 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Defendant First Community Bank's motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant First Community Bank shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than October 16, 2020. Signed on 9/17/20 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time filed by Jordan Paul on behalf of First Community Bank. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Paul, Jordan)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than 10/19/2020. Signed on 9/16/20 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Trans Union LLC.(Gilbert, Ronald)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jordan Paul on behalf of Defendant First Community Bank.(Paul, Jordan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Jordan Paul on behalf of First Community Bank (Attorney Jordan Paul added to party First Community Bank(pty:dft))(Paul, Jordan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, until October 19, 2020 filed by Bryon Andrew Pike on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Pike, Bryon)
September 15, 2020 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff, and FIRST NOTICE as to defendants Experian Information and Trans Union: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Bryon Andrew Pike on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Pike, Bryon)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Bryon Andrew Pike for Experian Information Solutions Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to allow Bryon Andrew Pike to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7045375) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Ronald C. Gilbert, III for Trans Union LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to allow Robert Gilbert III to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7030874) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Lubben, Todd)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Lubben, Todd)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd)
August 24, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions Inc., First Community Bank, Trans Union LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
July 31, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions Inc., First Community Bank, Trans Union LLC filed by Anthony Hernandez on behalf of Candice Nenneman. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6972402. Service due by 10/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Anthony) (Attachment 1 replaced with a non-editable (flattened) document on 7/31/2020) (Siegert, Karen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nenneman v. Experian Information Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Ronald C. Gilbert, III
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bank
Represented By: Jordan Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Bryon Andrew Pike
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Nenneman
Represented By: Anthony Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?