Oneal Milton, Jr. v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Oneal Milton, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05077
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Referring Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Oneal Milton, Jr, Andrew M. Saul. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
September 28, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: This is to advise you that your case has been reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. Consent to jurisdiction by Judge Gaddy is required to proceed before him. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jones, Robin) Modified on 9/28/2020 to correct docket text (Jones, Robin).
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER. With the consent of Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy, this case is hereby transferred to his docket for all further proceedings. Signed on September 28, 2020 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Transfer List) (Jones, Robin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Oneal Milton, Jr, Andrew M. Saul. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
September 2, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Siegert, Karen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Oneal Milton, Jr. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Oneal Milton, Jr. Service due by 11/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Counsel for plaintiff shall be responsible for electronically filing the complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order, and for service of process in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.Signed on 8/17/2020 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Alexander, Pam)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions.Plaintiff's Form due by 9/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Oneal Milton, Jr. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/31/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Oneal Milton, Jr(pty:dft))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oneal Milton, Jr. v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneal Milton, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?