Hold v. Saul
Plaintiff: Marvin Hold
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05130
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 1/25/2021 Social security answer due by 3/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 4/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: Atty General 1/27/21; ORC 1/22/21; US Atty 1/25/21)(Overton, Kathleen)
January 19, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Siegert, Karen)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Service must be obtained on defendant within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 1/13/21 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer associated with this case. New case number is 3:20-cv-05130-NKL. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Furtak, Rebecca)
January 4, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff and defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 1/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Marvin Hold. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMOWDC-7207628) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Marvin Hold. Service due by 3/31/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Marvin Hold(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hold v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Hold
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?